Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1948 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Perry S.B. No. 1948
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2025; March 17, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture and
 Rural Affairs; April 1, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 April 1, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1948 By:  Birdwell




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of fire prevention standards for certain
 agricultural facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle Z, Title 10, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 3001 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 3001. RESTRICTIONS ON CERTAIN FIRE REGULATIONS
 Sec. 3001.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Agricultural pole barn" means a nonresidential
 farm building in which 70 percent or more of the perimeter walls are
 permanently open and allow free ingress and egress.
 (2)  "Governmental entity" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 2007.002.
 (3)  "Livestock market" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 161.111, Agriculture Code.
 (4)  "Nonresidential farm building" means any
 temporary or permanent building on a farm, ranch, or other
 agricultural facility that is used primarily for agricultural
 purposes and not intended to be used as a residential dwelling.  The
 term includes a barn, greenhouse, shade house, farm office, storage
 building, workshop, poultry house, animal handling facility, or
 commodity storage and feed processing facility.
 Sec. 3001.002.  RESTRICTION ON REGULATION OF CERTAIN
 AGRICULTURAL FACILITIES.  Notwithstanding any other law, a
 governmental entity may not adopt or enforce an ordinance, order,
 rule, or other measure that requires the installation of a fire
 protection sprinkler system in:
 (1)  an agricultural pole barn;
 (2)  a nonresidential farm building;
 (3)  a cotton gin;
 (4)  a cottonseed storage building;
 (5)  a grain storage facility;
 (6)  a livestock market; or
 (7)  a commercial feed mill.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *