Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1967 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/07/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa of Hidalgo, Hinojosa of Nueces, Perry S.B. No. 1967
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2025; March 17, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture and
 Rural Affairs; April 7, 2025, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the projects eligible for financial assistance from the
 flood infrastructure fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 15.531(2), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (2)  "Flood project" means a drainage, flood
 mitigation, or flood control project, including:
 (A)  planning and design activities;
 (B)  work to obtain regulatory approval to provide
 nonstructural and structural flood mitigation and drainage;
 (C)  construction of structural flood mitigation
 and drainage infrastructure; [and]
 (D)  construction and implementation of
 nonstructural projects, including projects that use nature-based
 features to protect, mitigate, or reduce flood risk; and
 (E)  construction of multi-purpose flood
 mitigation and drainage infrastructure projects that control,
 divert, capture, or impound floodwater, stormwater, agricultural
 runoff water, or treated wastewater effluent and treat and
 distribute the water for the purpose of creating an additional
 source of water supply.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *