Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2053 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 2053
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2025; March 17, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Administration;
 April 14, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating the Governor's Medal of Service award to
 recognize service to the people of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 11, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 3108 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 3108. GOVERNOR'S MEDAL OF SERVICE AWARD
 Sec. 3108.001.  GOVERNOR'S MEDAL OF SERVICE AWARD. (a) The
 Governor's Medal of Service award may be awarded to a resident of
 this state who:
 (1)  honorably retired from a position of public
 service in state or local government;
 (2)  contributed to the residents of this state in an
 extraordinary way through the individual's work in the private
 sector; or
 (3)  contributed to the residents of this state in an
 extraordinary way as a member of the Texas Legislature.
 (b)  The governor may, at the governor's discretion, award
 not more than two Governor's Medal of Service awards each year.
 Sec. 3108.002.  GIFTS. The office of the governor may
 solicit and accept gifts, grants, and donations from any public or
 private source for any expenses related to the administration of
 the Governor's Medal of Service award, including establishing the
 award.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *