Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2110 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    2025S0069-1 02/04/25
 By: Bettencourt, et al. S.B. No. 2110




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to electric grid resiliency measures, including a study by
 the Public Utility Commission of Texas of the cost of burying
 overhead power lines.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section, "commission" means the
 Public Utility Commission of Texas.
 (b)  The commission shall evaluate:
 (1)  the potential costs of burying existing overhead
 power lines in seacoast territory, as defined by Section 2210.003,
 Insurance Code; and
 (2)  the potential costs of burying all existing
 overhead power lines in this state.
 (c)  The commission shall submit a report of the results of
 the study conducted under Subsection (b) of this section and any
 associated recommendations to the legislature not later than
 December 31, 2026.
 (d)  This section expires January 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 38, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 38.080 and 38.081 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.080.  WOODEN POLE REPLACEMENT IN SEACOAST TERRITORY.
 (a) The commission by rule shall require an electric utility
 operating in seacoast territory, as defined by Section 2210.003,
 Insurance Code, to:
 (1)  replace all wooden transmission or distribution
 poles in the service area of the utility in seacoast territory
 before January 1, 2045; and
 (2)  not later than September 1, 2026, submit to the
 commission a plan for the replacement.
 (b)  Each plan must prioritize the replacement of poles:
 (1)  located within 10 miles of the coast; or
 (2)  that serve critical infrastructure facilities, as
 defined by Section 424.001, Government Code.
 Sec. 38.081.  VEGETATION MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE AND REPORTING.
 (a) Each electric utility shall submit to the commission a
 vegetation management plan that provides for the clearing at least
 every three years of trees, tree limbs, and other vegetative growth
 from utility line easements and utility structures in the entire
 service area of the utility.
 (b)  Each electric utility shall establish:
 (1)  a procedure for a customer to request vegetation
 management service; and
 (2)  a procedure to ensure the performance of a service
 requested under Subdivision (1) not later than the 30th day after
 the date the customer makes the request, unless the requested
 service cannot legally or safely be performed.
 (c)  The commission by rule may adopt a standard vegetation
 management service request procedure for the purposes of this
 section.
 (d)  Not later than May 1 of each year, each electric utility
 shall submit to the commission a report describing the utility's
 vegetation management activities.
 SECTION 3.  Section 38.101(a), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Not later than May 1 of each year, each electric utility
 shall submit to the commission a report describing the utility's
 activities related to:
 (1)  identifying areas that are susceptible to damage
 during severe weather and hardening transmission and distribution
 facilities in those areas; and
 (2)  [vegetation management; and
 [(3)]  inspecting distribution poles.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.