Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2124 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/07/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 2124
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2025; March 24, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture and
 Rural Affairs; April 7, 2025, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to publication of the Texas Groundwater Protection
 Committee's annual report.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 26.406(c), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  In conjunction with the commission, the committee shall
 publish not later than June [April] 1 of each year a joint
 groundwater monitoring and contamination report covering the
 activities and findings of the committee made during the previous
 calendar year. The report must:
 (1)  describe the current status of groundwater
 monitoring programs conducted by or required by each agency at
 regulated facilities or in connection with regulated activities;
 (2)  contain a description of each case of groundwater
 contamination documented during the previous calendar year and of
 each case of groundwater contamination documented during previous
 periods for which enforcement action was incomplete at the time of
 issuance of the preceding report; and
 (3)  indicate the status of enforcement action for each
 case of groundwater contamination that is included in the report.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *