Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2200 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/14/2025

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 2200
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2025; March 24, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Border Security;
 April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 14, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2200 By:  Birdwell




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a prohibition on the operation or movement of certain
 overweight vehicles transporting hazardous materials under certain
 circumstances; creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 621, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 621.512 to read as follows:
 Sec. 621.512.  OPERATION OR MOVEMENT OF CERTAIN OVERWEIGHT
 VEHICLES TRANSPORTING HAZARDOUS MATERIALS PROHIBITED UNDER CERTAIN
 CIRCUMSTANCES. (a) A person commits an offense if the person
 operates or moves an overweight vehicle described by Subsection (b)
 on a public highway:
 (1)  that is not included in the route designated under
 the permit under which the vehicle is operating; or
 (2)  without a permit authorizing the movement of the
 vehicle and the vehicle exceeds the maximum gross weight authorized
 for the vehicle by at least five percent.
 (b)  Subsection (a) applies only to an overweight vehicle
 with three axles that is transporting in a cargo tank hazardous
 materials in a quantity requiring placarding by a regulation issued
 under the Hazardous Materials Transportation Act (49 U.S.C. Section
 5101 et seq.).
 (c)  An offense under this section is a felony of the second
 degree.
 (d)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution of an
 offense under this section that, at the time of the offense, the
 vehicle was being operated or moved under the immediate direction
 of a law enforcement agency.
 (e)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution of an
 offense under Subsection (a)(1) that, at the time of the offense,
 the vehicle was being operated or moved in compliance with a permit
 authorizing the movement of the vehicle issued by the department or
 a political subdivision of this state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *