89R15684 MM-D By: Miles S.B. No. 2287 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of the child-care advisory council. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 301, Labor Code, is amended by adding Subchapter L to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER L. CHILD-CARE ADVISORY COUNCIL Sec. 301.201. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "advisory council" means the child-care advisory council. Sec. 301.202. ESTABLISHMENT. The child-care advisory council is established to advise the commission regarding child-care issues. Sec. 301.203. MEMBERSHIP; TERMS; VACANCY. (a) The advisory council is composed of the following seven members: (1) one member who represents the child-care industry, appointed by the governor; (2) one member who represents the child-care industry, appointed by the lieutenant governor; (3) one member who represents the child-care industry, appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; (4) two members who represent local workforce development boards, appointed by the chair of the commission; and (5) two members who represent the business community, appointed by the chair of the commission. (b) Members of the advisory council serve staggered terms of four years, with the terms of half of the members, or as near to one-half as possible, expiring November 1 of each odd-numbered year. (c) A vacancy on the advisory council shall be filled for the unexpired term in the same manner as the original appointment. Sec. 301.204. PRESIDING OFFICER. The members of the advisory council shall select from among the members a presiding officer of the council. Sec. 301.205. COUNCIL MEETINGS. (a) The advisory council shall meet two times each year at the call of the presiding officer. (b) A majority of the voting members of the advisory council constitutes a quorum. Sec. 301.206. ADMINISTRATIVE AND STAFF SUPPORT. The commission shall provide administrative and staff support for the advisory council. Sec. 301.207. COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES. A member of the advisory council is not entitled to compensation for service as a member of the advisory council but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and necessary travel expenses incurred in performing functions as a member of the advisory council, as provided in the General Appropriations Act. Sec. 301.208. REPORT. The advisory council shall prepare and provide a report to the legislature not later than January 1 of each odd-numbered year. Sec. 301.209. APPLICATION OF OTHER LAW. Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the advisory council. SECTION 2. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective date of this Act but not later than November 1, 2025, the appropriate appointing authorities shall appoint the initial members to the child-care advisory council as required by Section 301.203, Labor Code, as added by this Act. (b) The initial members of the child-care advisory council shall determine by lot which three initial members of the council will serve terms that expire November 1, 2027, and which four members will serve terms that expire November 1, 2029. (c) Not later than December 1, 2025, the child-care advisory council established under Subchapter L, Chapter 301, Labor Code, as added by this Act, shall hold its initial meeting. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.