Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2326 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/12/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    89R4302 MPF-F
 By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 2326




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to universal changing facilities in places of
 public accommodation and public buildings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 341, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 341.070 to read as follows:
 Sec. 341.070.  UNIVERSAL CHANGING FACILITIES. (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Person with a disability" means a person with a
 physical, intellectual, behavioral, or cognitive impairment
 resulting in the person's inability to perform the activities of
 daily life.
 (2)  "Place of public accommodation" means any of the
 following locations:
 (A)  a place of exhibition, entertainment, or
 gathering, including a movie theater, theater of the dramatic or
 performing arts, concert hall, auditorium, sports arena or stadium,
 and convention center;
 (B)  a sales or rental establishment comprising at
 least 40,000 square feet, including a shopping mall and shopping
 center;
 (C)  a place of public display or collection,
 including a museum, library, and gallery;
 (D)  a place of recreation, including a park, zoo,
 and amusement park;
 (E)  a public or private primary or secondary
 school, a public or private institution of higher education, and
 any other place of education;
 (F)  a social service center, including a senior
 center and homeless shelter;
 (G)  a station or terminal used for specified
 public transportation, including an airport, train depot, and bus
 station; and
 (H)  a professional office of a health care
 provider, including a hospital and rehabilitation center.
 (3)  "Public building" means a building or facility
 used by the public and owned or controlled by this state or a
 political subdivision of this state.
 (4)  "Universal changing facility" means an enclosed
 family or assisted use toilet facility not designated by gender and
 designed for use by a person with a disability, with the assistance
 of the person's care provider, for personal hygiene purposes.
 (b)  This section applies only to a place of public
 accommodation or public building:
 (1)  that is constructed on or after January 1, 2026; or
 (2)  for which a building permit application is
 submitted on or after January 1, 2026, for renovation of its main
 facility, not including a parking garage or other parking area,
 with an estimated cost of at least $50,000.
 (c)  A person with control over the restrooms and changing
 facilities in a place of public accommodation or public building
 shall install in one or more of its restrooms or changing facilities
 a universal changing facility that is accessible to the general
 public and is not designated by gender.
 (d)  A universal changing facility installed as required
 under this section must contain:
 (1)  an electronic, height-adjustable adult changing
 table with a safety rail or safety belt; and
 (2)  amenities, including a waste receptacle, toilet,
 sink, soap dispenser, and paper towel dispenser.
 (e)  A universal changing facility installed as required
 under this section must comply with the guidelines established in
 the International Building Code and the American National Standards
 Institute Standard for Accessible and Usable Buildings and
 Facilities, commonly cited as "ANSI A117.1," as the code and that
 standard existed on January 1, 2024.
 (f)  A person with control over the restrooms and changing
 facilities in a place of public accommodation or public building
 shall post a sign in a conspicuous space and include on any central
 directory in the place or building clear language indicating the
 location of each restroom or changing facility with a universal
 changing facility.  The sign must comply with the 2012 Texas
 Accessibility Standards.
 (g)  The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation by rule
 shall establish exceptions to the required installation of a
 universal changing facility under this section for an owner of a
 place of public accommodation or public building who demonstrates
 that compliance with this section:
 (1)  would result in an undue financial burden on the
 owner; or
 (2)  is not possible due to the available space at the
 place or building.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2025, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules
 required by Section 341.070, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act.
 (b)  This section takes effect September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect January 1, 2026.