Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2357 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/28/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Perry S.B. No. 2357
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2025; March 25, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 28, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 28, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2357 By:  Perry




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a maternal health training program for certain health
 care providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 34A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 34A. MATERNAL HEALTH TRAINING PROGRAM FOR HEALTH CARE
 PROVIDERS
 Sec. 34A.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Health care provider" and "maternal morbidity"
 have the meanings assigned by Section 34.001.
 (2)  "Review committee" means the Texas Maternal
 Mortality and Morbidity Review Committee established under Chapter
 34.
 (3)  "TexasAIM" means the program established by the
 department in collaboration with the Alliance for Innovation on
 Maternal Health and the Texas Hospital Association to assist health
 care providers with implementing maternal safety projects and
 decreasing incidents of preventable maternal death and severe
 maternal morbidity by applying best practices for maternal safety
 and improving maternal health care.
 (4)  "Training program" means the maternal health
 training program established under Section 34A.002.
 Sec. 34A.002.  MATERNAL HEALTH TRAINING PROGRAM. (a) The
 department shall develop and implement a training program for
 health care providers providing health care services to maternal
 patients in this state.
 (b)  The training program must ensure health care providers
 providing health care services to maternal patients are equipped to
 deliver consistent, superior health care services.
 (c)  The department shall collaborate with the review
 committee to establish the training program curriculum. The
 training program curriculum must include:
 (1)  evidence-based protocols for obstetric
 emergencies;
 (2)  TexasAIM maternal safety best practices for
 specific maternal and postpartum conditions;
 (3)  maternal safety simulations; and
 (4)  other information the review committee recommends
 regarding best practices for reducing maternal mortality and
 morbidity rates.
 (d)  The executive commissioner and each appropriate
 licensing authority of a health care provider by rule shall require
 health care providers providing health care services to maternal
 patients to participate in the training program.
 Sec. 34A.003.  RULES. The executive commissioner shall
 adopt rules as necessary to establish and implement the training
 program under this chapter, including rules regarding monitoring
 health care provider compliance.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission and each appropriate licensing authority of a
 health care provider shall adopt the rules required by Chapter 34A,
 Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *