Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB24 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/17/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 24
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2025; March 6, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
 March 17, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; March 17, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 24 By:  Bettencourt




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion of an understanding of communist regimes
 and ideologies in the essential knowledge and skills for the social
 studies curriculum for certain public school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (h-11) and (h-12) to read as follows:
 (h-11)  In adopting the essential knowledge and skills for
 the social studies curriculum for each grade level from grade 4
 through grade 12, the State Board of Education shall, as
 appropriate, adopt essential knowledge and skills that develop each
 student's understanding of communist regimes and ideologies and
 include age appropriate and developmentally appropriate
 instruction with information on:
 (1)  the history of and tactics used by communist
 movements in the United States;
 (2)  historical events and atrocities attributable to
 communist regimes, including:
 (A)  the Cultural Revolution and the Great Leap
 Forward;
 (B)  the Holodomor, otherwise known as the
 Ukrainian Famine;
 (C)  the Soviet-era political purge known as the
 Great Terror;
 (D)  the Cambodian genocide under Pol Pot and the
 Khmer Rouge;
 (E)  the origins and policies of the Communist
 Party of Cuba;
 (F)  communist guerrilla movements in Latin
 America; and
 (G)  the oppression and suffering experienced by
 people living under communist regimes, including mass murder,
 violent land seizures, show trials, concentration camps, forced
 labor, poverty, and general economic deterioration;
 (3)  a comparative analysis of:
 (A)  the ideologies of communism and
 totalitarianism contrasted with the United States' founding
 principles of freedom and democracy; and
 (B)  collectivist ideologies contrasted with the
 United States' founding principles of individual rights,
 merit-based advancement, and free enterprise;
 (4)  modern threats to the United States and its allies
 posed by communist regimes and ideologies;
 (5)  common economic, industrial, and political events
 that historically precede communist revolutions;
 (6)  the evolution of communist ideologies from
 economic, class-based theories into broader cultural movements
 that divide societies and maintain collective control over
 individual rights;
 (7)  common historical and modern methods used to
 spread communist ideologies, including:
 (A)  propaganda;
 (B)  public shaming tactics;
 (C)  censorship; and
 (D)  forced conformity; and
 (8)  first-person accounts, in the form of in-person,
 video-recorded, or written testimony, from the victims of communist
 regimes.
 (h-12)  In adopting the essential knowledge and skills
 required under Subsection (h-11), the State Board of Education:
 (1)  shall adopt and publish standards for the required
 instruction;
 (2)  shall seek input from:
 (A)  victims of communism willing to share their
 first-person accounts; and
 (B)  nationally recognized organizations
 dedicated to commemorating victims of communism; and
 (3)  may incorporate material from existing
 educational programs that provide instruction on the topic of
 communist regimes and ideologies, if the material meets the
 standards adopted by the State Board of Education under Subdivision
 (1).
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2026-2027
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than July 31, 2026, the State Board of
 Education shall review and revise, as needed, the essential
 knowledge and skills of the social studies curriculum as required
 by Section 28.002(h-11), Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *