Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2422 Senate Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 04/28/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   C.S.S.B. 2422         By: Hall         Health & Human Services         4/25/2025         Committee Report (Substituted)          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   During the COVID-19 pandemic, guidance from public health officials varied drastically and changed frequently. Physicians had to rely on their medical expertise, in addition to formal guidance provided by numerous associations and departments, to treat this new illness.    Some doctors found that using off-label drugs to treat COVID-19, such as ivermectin, budesonide, and hydroxychloroquine, reduced the viral duration and shortened the duration of the illness. While using off-label drugs is not unusual, many doctors faced investigations from the Texas Medical Board (TMB), fines, and costly legal challenges because of their use of these drugs to treat COVID-19.    As such, the harm caused to physicians by the state, either to their reputation, financial, or licensing status, should be rectified. While some state agencies were quick to adjust to these developments and made changes to how they proceeded with complaints brought against healthcare professionals, the TMB has not been so inclined, and is still currently proceeding with investigations that involve these trivial issues.    Additionally, future disciplinary action on this arbitrary basis should be prohibited, so as to protect future physicians and allow them to freely exercise their best medical judgement in future cases.    (Original Author's/Sponsor's Statement of Intent)    C.S.S.B. 2422 amends current law relating to investigations and disciplinary or punitive action by the Texas Medical Board regarding certain treatments or practices regarding COVID-19 and to the required expungement of certain records.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter A, Chapter 153, Occupations Code, by adding Section 153.017, as follows:   Sec. 153.017. LIMITATION ON INVESTIGATIVE AND DISCIPLINARY AUTHORITY. Prohibits the Texas Medical Board (TMB), notwithstanding any other law, from investigating or taking disciplinary or other punitive action against a person regulated by TMB for:    (1) prescribing or advocating for the use of ivermectin, hydroxychloroquine, or budesonide in the prevention or treatment of COVID-19;    (2) making statements regarding the efficacy of masks in preventing the transmission of COVID-19; or   (3) failing to wear or require others to wear masks intended to prevent the transmission of COVID-19 in connection with the person's practice, other than in areas where it was customary to wear masks before the COVID-19 pandemic.   SECTION 2. Requires TMB, notwithstanding any other law and not later than December 1, 2025, to:   (1) review its records and expunge any record created on or after January 1, 2020, related to the investigation of or disciplinary or other punitive action taken against a person regulated by TMB if the record contains any of certain words; and   (2) in connection with each record expunged under Subdivision (1), vacate any disciplinary action imposed and rescind any other punitive action taken by TMB.    SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2025.

BILL ANALYSIS

Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 2422
 By: Hall
 Health & Human Services
 4/25/2025
 Committee Report (Substituted)



Senate Research Center

C.S.S.B. 2422

By: Hall

Health & Human Services

4/25/2025

Committee Report (Substituted)

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

During the COVID-19 pandemic, guidance from public health officials varied drastically and changed frequently. Physicians had to rely on their medical expertise, in addition to formal guidance provided by numerous associations and departments, to treat this new illness.

Some doctors found that using off-label drugs to treat COVID-19, such as ivermectin, budesonide, and hydroxychloroquine, reduced the viral duration and shortened the duration of the illness. While using off-label drugs is not unusual, many doctors faced investigations from the Texas Medical Board (TMB), fines, and costly legal challenges because of their use of these drugs to treat COVID-19.

As such, the harm caused to physicians by the state, either to their reputation, financial, or licensing status, should be rectified. While some state agencies were quick to adjust to these developments and made changes to how they proceeded with complaints brought against healthcare professionals, the TMB has not been so inclined, and is still currently proceeding with investigations that involve these trivial issues.

Additionally, future disciplinary action on this arbitrary basis should be prohibited, so as to protect future physicians and allow them to freely exercise their best medical judgement in future cases.

(Original Author's/Sponsor's Statement of Intent)

C.S.S.B. 2422 amends current law relating to investigations and disciplinary or punitive action by the Texas Medical Board regarding certain treatments or practices regarding COVID-19 and to the required expungement of certain records.

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter A, Chapter 153, Occupations Code, by adding Section 153.017, as follows:

Sec. 153.017. LIMITATION ON INVESTIGATIVE AND DISCIPLINARY AUTHORITY. Prohibits the Texas Medical Board (TMB), notwithstanding any other law, from investigating or taking disciplinary or other punitive action against a person regulated by TMB for:

(1) prescribing or advocating for the use of ivermectin, hydroxychloroquine, or budesonide in the prevention or treatment of COVID-19;

(2) making statements regarding the efficacy of masks in preventing the transmission of COVID-19; or

(3) failing to wear or require others to wear masks intended to prevent the transmission of COVID-19 in connection with the person's practice, other than in areas where it was customary to wear masks before the COVID-19 pandemic.

SECTION 2. Requires TMB, notwithstanding any other law and not later than December 1, 2025, to:

(1) review its records and expunge any record created on or after January 1, 2020, related to the investigation of or disciplinary or other punitive action taken against a person regulated by TMB if the record contains any of certain words; and

(2) in connection with each record expunged under Subdivision (1), vacate any disciplinary action imposed and rescind any other punitive action taken by TMB.

SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2025.