Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2443 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/16/2025

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 2443
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; March 25, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 16, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to electronic delivery of documents sent or received by
 the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.207, Occupations Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  The commission by rule may require an applicant or[,]
 license holder[, or other person who regularly receives
 correspondence from the department] to provide an e-mail address to
 the department [for purposes of receiving correspondence].  An
 e-mail address used under this subsection is confidential and is
 not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 (d)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission by rule
 may provide that any correspondence sent or received by the
 department be delivered electronically, including any notice,
 order, or pleading required under Chapter 2001, Government Code,
 this chapter, or a law establishing a regulatory program
 administered by the department.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 51.310(c) and 51.354(c), Occupations
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *