By: Nichols S.B. No. 2540 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16; April 22, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 22, 2025, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the terms of certain agreements involving minor boundary adjustments between two contiguous school districts. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 13.231, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows: (c) An agreement executed under this section on or after January 1, 2025, must include, if applicable: (1) any term or terms of the agreement, including restrictions, covenants, or contracts, that will continue to apply in force and effect with respect to the real property in the territory following the transfer of that territory from one school district to the other; and (2) a brief explanation of the privileges, rights, and responsibilities of each school district with respect to a term described under Subdivision (1). (d) For an agreement executed under this section on or after January 1, 2025, but before the effective date of this Act, a term described under Subsection (c)(1) is effective as of January 1, 2025, or a subsequent date agreed to by the parties. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. * * * * *