Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2605 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/30/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Blanco S.B. No. 2605
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 30, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 30, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the formation of a municipal housing authority asset
 commission by certain municipal housing authorities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 392, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter G to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER G. ASSET COMMISSION OF CERTAIN MUNICIPAL HOUSING
 AUTHORITIES
 Sec. 392.151.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "asset
 commission" means a municipal housing authority asset commission
 formed by a municipal housing authority under Section 392.153.
 Sec. 392.152.  APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies only
 to a municipal housing authority operating in:
 (1)  a county with a population of 800,000 or more that
 is located on the international border; and
 (2)  a municipality with a population of 600,000 or
 more that is located in a county described by Subdivision (1).
 Sec. 392.153.  FORMATION OF ASSET COMMISSION. The
 commissioners of a municipal housing authority may adopt a
 resolution to create an asset commission.
 Sec. 392.154.  ASSET COMMISSION MEMBERSHIP; TERMS. (a) An
 asset commission is composed of five members who serve staggered
 terms of five years and are appointed by a majority of the
 commissioners of the municipal housing authority that formed the
 asset commission. An asset commission member must:
 (1)  be a licensed real estate broker with at least five
 years of continuous experience in the field of multifamily housing;
 (2)  be a certified public accountant with at least
 five years of continuous experience in the field of multifamily
 housing;
 (3)  be a licensed attorney who is certified by the
 Texas Board of Legal Specialization in residential real estate law
 or commercial real estate law;
 (4)  have at least five years of continuous experience
 in developing, financing, constructing, operating, or managing a
 multifamily housing portfolio of no fewer than 3,000 units; or
 (5)  be a current or former chief executive officer,
 chief financial officer, or executive director of a public housing
 authority that owns or manages 5,000 or more units of housing,
 excluding housing units paid for with vouchers under the federal
 Section 8 Housing Choice Voucher Program.
 (b)  In addition to the qualifications required by
 Subsection (a), at least one of the asset commission members must
 have at least 10 years of experience in a field related to the
 management or operation of apartments funded by low income-housing
 tax credits.
 (c)  A person may not serve as an asset commission member if
 the person is:
 (1)  a mayor, a county judge, or any other elected
 official of a governmental entity within the area of operation
 described by Section 392.014 for the municipal housing authority
 that formed the asset commission;
 (2)  an employee of a town, municipality, county, or
 unit of local government within the area of operation described by
 Section 392.014 for the municipal housing authority that formed the
 asset commission;
 (3)  a commissioner or employee of the municipal
 housing authority that formed the asset commission;
 (4)  a person who was employed within the preceding two
 years by the municipal housing authority that formed the asset
 commission; or
 (5)  a person who has or has had within the preceding
 two years a direct or indirect contract or a personal or financial
 interest in a contract with the municipal housing authority that
 formed the asset commission.
 (d)  Notwithstanding the provisions of Subsection (a)
 establishing the terms of an asset commission member, in appointing
 the initial members to an asset commission under this section, the
 commissioners of a municipal housing authority shall designate:
 (1)  two members to serve a three-year term;
 (2)  two members to serve a four-year term; and
 (3)  one member to serve a five-year term.
 Sec. 392.155.  CONFLICTS OF INTEREST. (a) An asset
 commission member may not:
 (1)  have dealings for pecuniary gain with the
 municipal housing authority that formed the asset commission or a
 public facility corporation sponsored by the authority; or
 (2)  own, acquire, or control a direct or indirect
 interest in any item described by Sections 392.042(b)(1)-(5).
 (b)  If an asset commission member manages, owns, acquires,
 or controls a direct or indirect interest in an item prohibited by
 Subsection (a) or otherwise has any other dealings for pecuniary
 gain with the municipal housing authority, the member shall
 immediately disclose the interest to the authority and asset
 commission in writing. The disclosure shall be entered in the
 minutes of the asset commission for the meeting at which the
 disclosure was made.
 (c)  An asset commission member's failure to make a required
 disclosure under Subsection (b) constitutes misconduct of office.
 Sec. 392.156.  REMOVAL OF ASSET COMMISSION MEMBER. An asset
 commission member may be removed by a majority of the commissioners
 of the municipal housing authority that formed the asset commission
 based on the same criteria and following the same processes for the
 removal of a commissioner described by Section 392.041.
 Sec. 392.157.  ASSET COMMISSION MEMBER COMPENSATION AND
 REIMBURSEMENT. (a) An asset commission member is entitled to:
 (1)  reasonable compensation for the member's services
 on the asset commission; and
 (2)  reimbursement for necessary expenses incurred by
 the member in carrying out duties related to the member's services
 on the asset commission, including travel expenses.
 (b)  The municipal housing authority that forms an asset
 commission shall pay the compensation and reimbursement described
 by Subsection (a).
 Sec. 392.158.  POWERS AND DUTIES. (a) An asset commission
 must approve by majority vote the following actions before the
 municipal housing authority that formed the asset commission may
 perform or approve the action:
 (1)  the acquisition, sale, transfer, conveyance, or
 disposition of any property, building, partnership interest,
 membership interest in a limited liability company, ownership
 interest in any entity, or any other asset of the authority or a
 public facility corporation sponsored by the authority valued in
 excess of $100,000; and
 (2)  the trading, financing, refinancing, or issuance
 of a bond secured by or associated with any property, building,
 partnership interest, membership interest in a limited liability
 company, ownership interest in any entity, or any other asset of the
 authority or a public facility corporation sponsored by the
 authority.
 (b)  An asset commission may directly or indirectly hold or
 own an interest in an asset described by Subsection (a) and any
 accompanying cash flow or benefit associated with that interest
 only if the asset commission holds the interest in trust for the
 sole and exclusive benefit of the municipal housing authority that
 formed the asset commission.
 (c)  An asset commission may delegate the powers and duties
 under this section to an agent or employee of the asset commission
 or the municipal housing authority that formed the asset
 commission, as determined appropriate by the asset commission.
 Sec. 392.159.  OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES OF ASSET COMMISSION.
 The secretary and executive director employed under Section 392.038
 for a municipal housing authority that forms an asset commission
 shall serve as the secretary and executive director of the asset
 commission.
 Sec. 392.160.  MEETINGS OF ASSET COMMISSION. Meetings of an
 asset commission are subject to Chapter 551, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *