Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2692 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/16/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 2692
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture and
 Rural Affairs; April 16, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 16, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2692 By:  Hancock




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the filing of an appeal regarding certain water,
 drainage, or sewer rates with the Public Utility Commission of
 Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.043(c), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  An appeal under Subsection (b) must be initiated by
 filing a petition for review with the utility commission and the
 entity providing service within 90 days after the effective day of
 the rate change or, if appealing under Subsection [Subdivision]
 (b)(2) or (5), within 90 days after the date on which the governing
 body of the municipality or affected county makes a final decision.
 The petition must be signed by at least:
 (1)  the lesser of 10,000 or 10 percent of those
 ratepayers whose rates have been changed and who are eligible to
 appeal under Subsection (b); or
 (2)  10 percent of those ratepayers in the same
 customer class whose rates have been changed and who are eligible to
 appeal under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *