Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2696 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/01/2025

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             May 1, 2025       TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: SB2696 by Campbell (Relating to the regulation of the performance of advanced cosmetic procedures; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.), As Introduced     The fiscal implications of the bill cannot be determined due to an unknown potential licensee population. Therefore, the estimated additional workload accomplished by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR) and the additional revenue to the General Revenue Fund cannot be determined.  The bill would amend the Texas Occupations Code to require TDLR to administer a new chapter related to "Advanced Cosmetic Procedure". The bill would require TDLR to administer licenses, develop and administer an exam, set and collect fees, and take enforcement actions related to an advanced cosmetic procedure license. Based on the information provided by TDLR, the size of the potential licensee population, and thus workload associated with licensing, customer service, inspections, and enforcement, cannot be estimated. Based on analysis provided by TDLR, this estimate assumes the agency would require, at minimum, two additional Program Specialist full-time-equivalent positions to vet training courses, develop the examination, administer the examination, and assist other departments within the agency about technical information regarding the new license type. These two additional positions would cost $207,104 in the first year, and $192,272 in all subsequent years. This estimate assumes that if the licensee population is small enough, TDLR would be able to accomplish additional licensing and enforcement duties by utilizing existing resources. Based upon analyses provided by the Comptroller of Public Accounts and TDLR, no revenue implications to the State can be estimated as the licensee population in unknown. The bill would authorize TDLR to set and collect fees necessary to administer the chapter, but without knowing the size of the potential population, the estimated fee amount or if it would have a positive impact on the General Revenue Fund 001 is unknown.The bill would take effect September 1, 2025, but TDLR is required to adopt rules by December 1, 2025, approve education and examinations by March 1, 2026, and licenses would not be required until July 1, 2026.   Local Government ImpactNo fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.  Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 313 Department of Information Resources, 452 Department of Licensing and Regulation  LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, RStu, BFa, SD

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 89TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 1, 2025



TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: SB2696 by Campbell (Relating to the regulation of the performance of advanced cosmetic procedures; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.), As Introduced

TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB2696 by Campbell (Relating to the regulation of the performance of advanced cosmetic procedures; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.), As Introduced



Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce

Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB2696 by Campbell (Relating to the regulation of the performance of advanced cosmetic procedures; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.), As Introduced

SB2696 by Campbell (Relating to the regulation of the performance of advanced cosmetic procedures; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.), As Introduced

The fiscal implications of the bill cannot be determined due to an unknown potential licensee population. Therefore, the estimated additional workload accomplished by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR) and the additional revenue to the General Revenue Fund cannot be determined.

The fiscal implications of the bill cannot be determined due to an unknown potential licensee population. Therefore, the estimated additional workload accomplished by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR) and the additional revenue to the General Revenue Fund cannot be determined.

The bill would amend the Texas Occupations Code to require TDLR to administer a new chapter related to "Advanced Cosmetic Procedure". The bill would require TDLR to administer licenses, develop and administer an exam, set and collect fees, and take enforcement actions related to an advanced cosmetic procedure license. Based on the information provided by TDLR, the size of the potential licensee population, and thus workload associated with licensing, customer service, inspections, and enforcement, cannot be estimated. Based on analysis provided by TDLR, this estimate assumes the agency would require, at minimum, two additional Program Specialist full-time-equivalent positions to vet training courses, develop the examination, administer the examination, and assist other departments within the agency about technical information regarding the new license type. These two additional positions would cost $207,104 in the first year, and $192,272 in all subsequent years. This estimate assumes that if the licensee population is small enough, TDLR would be able to accomplish additional licensing and enforcement duties by utilizing existing resources. Based upon analyses provided by the Comptroller of Public Accounts and TDLR, no revenue implications to the State can be estimated as the licensee population in unknown. The bill would authorize TDLR to set and collect fees necessary to administer the chapter, but without knowing the size of the potential population, the estimated fee amount or if it would have a positive impact on the General Revenue Fund 001 is unknown.The bill would take effect September 1, 2025, but TDLR is required to adopt rules by December 1, 2025, approve education and examinations by March 1, 2026, and licenses would not be required until July 1, 2026.

Based on the information provided by TDLR, the size of the potential licensee population, and thus workload associated with licensing, customer service, inspections, and enforcement, cannot be estimated. Based on analysis provided by TDLR, this estimate assumes the agency would require, at minimum, two additional Program Specialist full-time-equivalent positions to vet training courses, develop the examination, administer the examination, and assist other departments within the agency about technical information regarding the new license type. These two additional positions would cost $207,104 in the first year, and $192,272 in all subsequent years. This estimate assumes that if the licensee population is small enough, TDLR would be able to accomplish additional licensing and enforcement duties by utilizing existing resources.

Based upon analyses provided by the Comptroller of Public Accounts and TDLR, no revenue implications to the State can be estimated as the licensee population in unknown. The bill would authorize TDLR to set and collect fees necessary to administer the chapter, but without knowing the size of the potential population, the estimated fee amount or if it would have a positive impact on the General Revenue Fund 001 is unknown.

The bill would take effect September 1, 2025, but TDLR is required to adopt rules by December 1, 2025, approve education and examinations by March 1, 2026, and licenses would not be required until July 1, 2026.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 313 Department of Information Resources, 452 Department of Licensing and Regulation



304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 313 Department of Information Resources, 452 Department of Licensing and Regulation

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, RStu, BFa, SD



JMc, RStu, BFa, SD