Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2705 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/16/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hagenbuch S.B. No. 2705
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 16, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fees for the issuance of certain specialty license
 plates and an exemption from vehicle registration for certain
 trailers, semitrailers, tractors, and implements of husbandry.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.147 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.147.  CERTAIN FARM TRAILERS, FARM SEMITRAILERS,
 FARM TRACTORS, AND IMPLEMENTS OF HUSBANDRY. An owner is not
 required to register a farm trailer or farm semitrailer with a gross
 weight of 4,000 pounds or less or a farm tractor or an implement of
 husbandry if the trailer, semitrailer, tractor, or implement is
 operated only temporarily on the highways.
 SECTION 2.  Section 504.3015(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person applying for a set of license plates under this
 subchapter shall pay the registration fee required under Chapter
 502 and the applicable special plate fee required under this
 section, except that one set of license plates shall be issued
 without the payment of the registration fee under:
 (1)  Section 504.308;
 (2)  Section 504.310(b);
 (3)  Section 504.315, other than Subsections (c) and
 (q) of that section; [and]
 (4)  Section 504.316; and
 (5)  Section 504.319.
 SECTION 3.  Section 504.512, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (b)  There is no fee for issuance of the license plates.
 SECTION 4.  Section 504.513, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The department shall issue specialty license plates
 for:
 (1)  volunteer firefighters certified by:
 (A)  the Texas Commission on Fire Protection; or
 (B)  the State Firefighters' [Firemen's] and Fire
 Marshals' Association of Texas; and
 (2)  fire protection personnel as that term is defined
 by Section 419.021, Government Code.
 (c)  There is no fee for issuance of the license plates.
 SECTION 5.  Section 504.516, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  There is no fee for issuance of the license plates.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *