Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2733 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Cook S.B. No. 2733




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of certain participating entities to
 participate in the uniform group coverage program for active school
 employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1579, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1579.1551 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1579.1551.  PARTICIPATING ENTITY PROGRAM
 PARTICIPATION. (a) This section applies to a participating entity
 that discontinued participation in the program effective on
 September 1, 2022, in accordance with Section 1579.155(a).
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 1579.155(b), a participating
 entity to which this section applies may elect to participate in the
 program before the fifth anniversary of the effective date of the
 participating entity's election to discontinue participation in
 the program if the participating entity:
 (1)  provides written notice to the trustee not later
 than December 31, 2025, of the participating entity 's election to
 participate in the program effective beginning September 1, 2026;
 and
 (2)  complies with any other requirements established
 by the trustee for program participation.
 (c)  For the plan year beginning September 1, 2026, the
 trustee shall impose a risk stabilization fee in an amount
 determined by the trustee on the premiums of a participating entity
 to which this section applies.
 (d)  A participating entity that elects to participate in the
 program in accordance with this section may not elect to
 discontinue participation until September 1, 2031.
 (e)  The trustee by rule may impose additional requirements,
 conditions, and deadlines with which a participating entity to
 which this section applies must comply to elect to participate in
 the program in accordance with this section.
 (f)  This section expires September 1, 2031.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.