Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2743 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2025

                    By: Hagenbuch S.B. No. 2743
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 15, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 15, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2743 By:  Hughes




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of certain election offenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 2A.104, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-1), if [If] an
 attorney representing the state is disqualified to act in any case
 or proceeding, is absent from the county or district, or is
 otherwise unable to perform the duties of the attorney's office, or
 if there is no attorney representing the state, the judge of the
 court in which the attorney represents the state may appoint to
 perform the duties of the attorney's office during the attorney's
 absence or disqualification:
 (1)  an attorney representing the state from any county
 or district; or
 (2)  an assistant attorney general.
 (b-1)  If an attorney representing the state is disqualified
 to act under Article 2A.105(d) or 2A.1051, the judge of the court in
 which the attorney represents the state shall appoint an assistant
 attorney general to perform the duties of the attorney's office
 during the attorney's disqualification.  The duties of the
 assistant attorney general appointed under this subsection are
 additional duties of the office of the attorney general, and the
 office of the attorney general is not entitled to additional
 compensation for performing those duties.
 SECTION 2.  Article 2A.105, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  A judge of a court in which a district or county attorney
 represents the state shall declare the attorney disqualified for
 purposes of Article 2A.104(b-1) with respect to a criminal case or
 proceeding involving the election laws of this state, on a showing
 that the attorney has adopted a policy or practice, or is following
 or enforcing a policy or practice, under which the attorney
 consistently refuses or declines to prosecute a violation of the
 election laws of this state.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter C, Chapter 2A, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Article 2A.1051 to read as follows:
 Art. 2A.1051.  PETITION TO DISQUALIFY IN CERTAIN CASES. (a)
 A person who has resided in the same county of this state for at
 least six months may file, in any district or county court for that
 county, a petition seeking the disqualification of a district or
 county attorney who serves that county or an adjacent county if:
 (1)  the district or county attorney filed a criminal
 case or proceeding involving the election laws of this state in a
 court for the county in which the person resides or for a county
 adjacent to the county in which the person resides; and
 (2)  the person has reason to believe the district or
 county attorney has adopted a policy or practice, or is following or
 enforcing a policy or practice, under which the attorney
 consistently refuses or declines to prosecute a violation of the
 election laws of this state.
 (b)  The judge of the court in which a petition is filed under
 Subsection (a) shall declare the attorney against whom the petition
 is filed disqualified for purposes of Article 2A.104(b-1) on the
 petitioner showing that the attorney has adopted or is following or
 enforcing a policy or practice described by Subsection (a)(2). If
 the judge disqualifies an attorney under this subsection, the judge
 shall send notice to the judge of the court in which the case
 described by Subsection (a)(1) is pending that the attorney is
 disqualified and an appointment under Article 2A.104(b-1) is
 required.
 (c)  Before a charging instrument in a criminal case is
 filed, with respect to a violation of the election laws of this
 state that a person has reason to believe occurred in the county in
 which the person resides, a person described by Subsection (a) may
 file a petition seeking to refer the investigation and prosecution
 of the violation to the office of the attorney general with a court
 described by that subsection in the same manner as if the violation
 had been filed as a case or proceeding described by Subsection
 (a)(1).  A judge of a court in which a petition is filed under this
 subsection shall refer the case to the office of the attorney
 general if the petitioner makes the showing required by Subsection
 (b) with respect to the district or county attorney serving the
 petitioner's county of residence.
 SECTION 4.  Section 273.021, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  In accordance with an appointment made under Article
 2A.104(b-1), Code of Criminal Procedure, the attorney general may
 prosecute a criminal offense prescribed by the election laws of
 this state on the disqualification of a district or county attorney
 under Article 2A.105(d) or 2A.1051, Code of Criminal Procedure, or
 on the referral of the case under Article 2A.1051(c), Code of
 Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 the prosecution of an offense committed on or after the effective
 date of this Act.  The prosecution of an offense committed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the offense was committed, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.  For purposes of this section, an
 offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if any
 element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *