Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2786 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2025

                    By: Creighton, Menéndez S.B. No. 2786
 (In the Senate - Filed March 14, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
 April 22, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 22, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2786 By:  West




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from the assessment requirements of the
 Texas Success Initiative for certain students who are public
 officers or employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.332, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 51.332.  APPLICABILITY. This subchapter does not apply
 to:
 (1)  a student who has graduated with an associate or
 baccalaureate degree from an institution of higher education;
 (2)  a student who transfers to an institution of
 higher education from a private or independent institution of
 higher education or an accredited out-of-state institution of
 higher education and who has satisfactorily completed
 college-level coursework;
 (3)  a student who is enrolled in a certificate program
 of one year or less at a public junior college, a public technical
 institute, or a public state college;
 (4)  a student who is serving on active duty as a member
 of:
 (A)  the armed forces of the United States; or
 (B)  the Texas National Guard;
 (5)  a student who is currently serving as and, for at
 least the three-year period preceding enrollment, has served as a
 member of a reserve component of the armed forces of the United
 States; [or]
 (6)  a student who on or after August 1, 1990, was
 honorably discharged, retired, or released from:
 (A)  active duty as a member of the armed forces of
 the United States or the Texas National Guard; or
 (B)  service as a member of a reserve component of
 the armed forces of the United States;
 (7)  a student who is:
 (A)  certified as an emergency medical technician
 under Chapter 773, Health and Safety Code; and
 (B)  employed by a political subdivision;
 (8)  a student who is included as fire protection
 personnel by Section 419.021, Government Code; or
 (9)  a student who is elected, appointed, or employed
 to serve as a peace officer described by Article 2A.001, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, or other law.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies
 beginning with the assessment of entering undergraduate students at
 public institutions of higher education for the 2025 fall semester.
 The assessment of an entering undergraduate student for an academic
 term before that semester is covered by the law in effect before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *