Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2807 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/23/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hagenbuch S.B. No. 2807
 (In the Senate - Filed March 14, 2025; April 7, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 23, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the considerations when determining whether an operator
 of a motor vehicle is an employee of a motor carrier or an
 independent contractor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle F, Title 7, Transportation Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 644A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 644A. MOTOR CARRIER SAFETY IMPROVEMENT:  EMPLOYMENT STATUS
 Sec. 644A.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Motor carrier" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 643.001.
 (2)  "Motor carrier safety improvement" means any
 device, equipment, software, technology, procedure, training,
 policy, program, or operational practice that is intended and
 primarily used to improve or facilitate:
 (A)  compliance with traffic safety or motor
 carrier safety laws;
 (B)  safety of a motor vehicle;
 (C)  safety of an operator of a motor vehicle; and
 (D)  safety of third-party users of public
 roadways.
 Sec. 644A.002.  EMPLOYMENT STATUS. The deployment,
 implementation, or use of a motor carrier safety improvement by or
 as required by a motor carrier or a related entity, including
 through contract, may not be considered when determining whether
 the operator of a motor vehicle is an employee or joint employee of
 the motor carrier or an independent contractor for purposes of
 state law.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *