Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB291 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 291
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 31, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 291 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the failure to disclose certain appraisal reports by an
 entity with eminent domain authority in connection with an offer to
 acquire real property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.0111(a), Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  An entity with eminent domain authority that wants to
 acquire real property for a public use shall, by certified mail,
 return receipt requested, disclose to the property owner at the
 time an offer to purchase or lease the property is made any and all
 appraisal reports produced or acquired by the entity relating
 specifically to the owner's property and prepared in the 10 years
 preceding the date of the offer. An entity that fails to meet the
 requirements of this subsection is liable to the owner for
 reasonable attorney's fees incurred by the owner to obtain a
 disclosure required by this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the acquisition of real property in connection with an initial
 offer made under Section 21.0113, Property Code, on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An acquisition of real property in
 connection with an initial offer made under Section 21.0113,
 Property Code, before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law applicable to the acquisition immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *