Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2986 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2025

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 2986
 (In the Senate - Filed March 14, 2025; April 7, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
 April 24, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 24, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2986 By:  Hinojosa of Nueces




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to use by a religious organization of public school or
 institution of higher education facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 11, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 11.173 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.173.  USE OF SCHOOL FACILITIES BY RELIGIOUS
 ORGANIZATION. (a) A school district or open-enrollment charter
 school may allow a religious organization to use the district's or
 school's facilities to host religious worship, services, sermons,
 or assemblies only if:
 (1)  the use of the facilities does not interfere with
 the district's or school's primary educational mission;
 (2)  the religious organization provides the fair
 market rental value or reimbursement for utilities, security, and
 other costs related to the use of the facilities as determined by
 the board of trustees of the district or the governing body of the
 school, unless waived by the board or governing body;
 (3)  the religious organization agrees to be held
 liable for any damages that occur in the organization's use of the
 facilities; and
 (4)  any additional requirements imposed by other law
 for the use of the facilities are satisfied.
 (b)  A state agency, political subdivision, school district,
 or other governmental entity may not impose a penalty or sanction on
 or deny funding to a school district or open-enrollment charter
 school based on the district's or school's decision to allow a
 religious organization to use the district's or school's facilities
 in the manner provided by Subsection (a).
 (c)  This section may not be construed to require a school
 district or open-enrollment charter school to allow a religious
 organization to use the district's or school's facilities for
 religious purposes if the district or school elects not to do so.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.984 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.984.  USE OF INSTITUTION FACILITIES BY RELIGIOUS
 ORGANIZATION. (a) In this section, "institution of higher
 education" has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  An institution of higher education may allow a religious
 organization to use the institution's facilities to host religious
 worship, services, sermons, or assemblies only if:
 (1)  the use of the facilities does not interfere with
 the institution's primary educational mission;
 (2)  the religious organization provides the fair
 market rental value or reimbursement for utilities, security, and
 other costs related to the use of the facilities as determined by
 the institution or the institution's governing board, unless waived
 by the institution or the institution's governing board;
 (3)  the religious organization agrees to be held
 liable for any damages that occur in the organization's use of the
 facilities; and
 (4)  any additional requirements imposed by other law
 for the use of the facilities are satisfied.
 (c)  A state agency, political subdivision, or other
 governmental entity may not impose a penalty or sanction on or deny
 funding to an institution of higher education based on the
 institution's decision to allow a religious organization to use the
 institution's facilities in the manner provided by Subsection (b).
 (d)  This section may not be construed to require an
 institution of higher education to allow a religious organization
 to use the institution's facilities for religious purposes if the
 institution elects not to do so.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act do not affect
 the terms of a contract entered into before the effective date of
 this Act, except that if the contract is renewed, modified, or
 extended on or after the effective date of this Act, the changes in
 law made by this Act apply to the contract beginning on the date of
 renewal, modification, or extension.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *