Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB3014 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/16/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 3014
 (In the Senate - Filed March 14, 2025; April 7, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 16, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 16, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 3014 By:  Hall




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of technical and clerical errors
 contained in registrations and reports filed with the Texas Ethics
 Commission and the commission's authority regarding the imposition
 of certain penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 571.0631, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 571.0631.  RULES CONCERNING TECHNICAL AND CLERICAL
 ERRORS [VIOLATIONS].  (a) The commission shall adopt rules
 prescribing procedures for [investigating and] resolving technical
 and clerical errors contained in [violations of laws within the
 commission's jurisdiction.  For] registrations and reports filed
 under laws within the commission's jurisdiction [Chapter 305, the
 commission shall consider clerical violations to include obvious
 typographical errors]. The rules must clearly outline:
 (1)  the types of errors that constitute a technical or
 clerical error; and
 (2)  the time and manner for correcting a technical or
 clerical error.
 (b)  A registrant filing a registration or report shall
 [under Chapter 305 may] correct obvious typographical errors
 [without penalty] by filing either a corrected registration or
 report or an updated or amended registration or report.
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission may not
 assess a penalty or fine against a person who files a registration
 or report that contains a technical or clerical error based solely
 on the error.
 SECTION 2.  Section 571.173, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 571.173.  CIVIL PENALTY FOR DELAY OR VIOLATION.  (a)
 The commission may impose a civil penalty of not more than $5,000 or
 triple the amount at issue under a law administered and enforced by
 the commission, whichever amount is more, for a delay in complying
 with a commission order or for a violation of a law administered and
 enforced by the commission.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission may only
 impose a civil penalty for a violation of a law administered and
 enforced by the commission if the violation is committed knowingly.
 For purposes of this subsection, a violation is presumed to have not
 been committed knowingly if the amount at issue is less than $500.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 571.1731, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 571.1731.  WAIVER OR REDUCTION OF [LATE FILING]
 PENALTY.
 SECTION 4.  Section 571.1731(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A person may request the waiver or reduction of a civil
 penalty [under Section 305.033(b) or 572.033(b) of this code or
 Section 254.042(b), Election Code,] by submitting an affidavit to
 the executive director that states the filer's reasons for
 requesting a waiver or reduction.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 572.033(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission shall determine from any available
 evidence whether a statement required to be filed under this
 subchapter is late. On making a determination that the statement is
 late, the commission shall immediately mail a notice of the
 determination to the individual responsible for filing the
 statement [and to the appropriate attorney for the state].
 (b)  If a statement is determined to be late, the individual
 responsible for filing the statement is liable to the state for a
 civil penalty of $500.  [If a statement is more than 30 days late,
 the commission shall issue a warning of liability by registered
 mail to the individual responsible for the filing. If the penalty
 is not paid before the 10th day after the date on which the warning
 is received, the individual is liable for a civil penalty in an
 amount determined by commission rule, but not to exceed $10,000.]
 SECTION 6.  Section 572.034(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An individual commits an offense if the individual is a
 state officer or candidate or state party chair and knowingly and
 wilfully fails to file a financial statement as required by this
 subchapter on three separate occasions.
 SECTION 7.  The following provisions of the Government Code
 are repealed:
 (1)  Section 571.079;
 (2)  Section 572.007; and
 (3)  Section 572.033(c).
 SECTION 8.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a registration, report, or statement that is required to be filed
 with the Texas Ethics Commission on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A registration, report, or statement that is required to
 be filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the registration, report, or statement is
 required to be filed, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 conduct constituting a violation of a law administered and enforced
 by the Texas Ethics Commission that occurs on or after the effective
 date of this Act. Conduct constituting a violation of a law
 administered and enforced by the commission that occurs before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the conduct occurs, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *