Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB396 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/26/2025

                    By: Kolkhorst, Bettencourt, Paxton S.B. No. 396
 (In the Senate - Filed November 20, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 26, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 1; March 26, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to confirmation of a voter's residence by a voter
 registrar.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 15.051(a), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The [If the registrar has reason to believe that a
 voter's current residence is different from that indicated on the
 registration records, or that the voter's residence address is a
 commercial post office box or similar location that does not
 correspond to a residence, the] registrar shall deliver to a [the]
 voter a written confirmation notice requesting confirmation of the
 voter's current residence if:
 (1)  the voter's residence address is a commercial post
 office box or similar location that does not correspond to a
 residence;
 (2)  on November 30 following a general election:
 (A)  the voter's name is not on the suspense list;
 and
 (B)  the voter has not voted in any election
 during the previous 25 months; or
 (3)  the registrar has any other reason to believe that
 a voter's current residence is different from that indicated on the
 registration records.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *