Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB397 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

                    By: Sparks S.B. No. 397
 (In the Senate - Filed November 20, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 31, 2025, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to rules regarding the provision by a health professional
 of a telemedicine medical service, teledentistry dental service, or
 telehealth service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 111.004, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
 (c)  Each agency with regulatory authority over a health
 professional providing a telemedicine medical service,
 teledentistry dental service, or telehealth service shall adopt
 rules necessary to standardize formats for and retention of records
 related to a patient's consent to:
 (1)  treatment;
 (2)  data collection; and
 (3)  data sharing.
 (d)  Rules adopted under Subsection (c) must:
 (1)  as applicable, address the specific consent
 documentation required for:
 (A)  telemedicine medical services;
 (B)  teledentistry dental services; or
 (C)  telehealth services; and
 (2)  include provisions, based on the appropriate
 standard of care, for consent documentation in an audio-only
 format.
 (e)  Rules adopted under this section must require that a
 health professional conduct an in-person examination of a patient
 before an irreversible medical procedure is initiated.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *