Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB413 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/17/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Middleton S.B. No. 413
 (In the Senate - Filed November 21, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 March 17, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 17, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 413 By:  Paxton




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the meetings of the boards of trustees of independent
 school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.0621, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 11.0621.  MEETINGS.  (a)  The minutes[, certified
 agenda, or recording, as applicable,] of a regular or special
 meeting of the board of trustees must reflect each member's:
 (1)  attendance at or absence from the meeting; and
 (2)  vote on any item that is voted on by the board at
 the meeting.
 (b)  The board of trustees shall post on the district's
 Internet website:
 (1)  the minutes described by Subsection (a) not later
 than the seventh day after the date of a meeting at which a quorum of
 the board is present and voting; and
 (2)  any resolution adopted by the board not later than
 the seventh day after the date of the meeting at which the
 resolution was adopted.
 (c)  The board of trustees shall make a recording of each
 regular or special meeting of the board.
 (d)  The minutes and [or tape] recording of an open meeting
 must be accessible to the public in accordance with Section
 551.022, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *