Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB463 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/14/2025

                    By: Campbell, Blanco S.B. No. 463
 (In the Senate - Filed November 22, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 14, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 463 By:  Hancock




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of facility for purposes of workplace
 violence prevention requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 331.001(3), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (3)  "Facility" means:
 (A)  a home and community support services agency
 licensed or licensed and certified under Chapter 142 [to provide
 home health services as defined by Section 142.001] that employs at
 least two registered nurses;
 (B)  a hospital licensed under Chapter 241 and a
 hospital maintained or operated by an agency of this state that is
 exempt from licensing under that chapter;
 (C)  a nursing facility licensed under Chapter 242
 that employs at least two registered nurses;
 (D)  an ambulatory surgical center licensed under
 Chapter 243;
 (E)  a freestanding emergency medical care
 facility as defined by Section 254.001; [and]
 (F)  a mental hospital licensed under Chapter 577;
 (G)  an intermediate care facility for
 individuals with an intellectual disability licensed under Chapter
 252; and
 (H)  a state supported living center as defined by
 Section 531.002.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2026, a home and
 community support services agency, intermediate care facility for
 individuals with an intellectual disability, or state supported
 living center that becomes subject to Chapter 331, Health and
 Safety Code, under Section 331.001, Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by this Act, shall comply with the requirements of that
 chapter.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *