Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB509 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/17/2025

                    By: Bettencourt, et al. S.B. No. 509
 (In the Senate - Filed November 25, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 17, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; March 17, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring notice to the attorney general in an action
 under the Election Code seeking a temporary restraining order.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter E, Chapter 273,
 Election Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. INJUNCTION OR RESTRAINING ORDER
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 273, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 273.082 to read as follows:
 Sec. 273.082.  TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; NOTICE.  As soon
 as practicable before a hearing in an action under this code seeking
 a temporary restraining order, a court must notify the attorney
 general of the hearing.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *