Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB511 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2025

                    By: Bettencourt, et al. S.B. No. 511
 (In the Senate - Filed November 25, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 7, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 7, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 511 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting an officer or employee of this state or of a
 political subdivision of this state from distributing certain voter
 registration application forms; creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 13, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 13.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.009.  DISTRIBUTION OF APPLICATION; OFFENSE.  (a)
 Except as otherwise provided by a provision of this code, including
 provisions of this chapter and Chapter 20, an officer or employee of
 this state or of a political subdivision of this state may not
 distribute a form on which a person may apply for registration to a
 person who did not request it.
 (b)  An officer or employee of this state or of a political
 subdivision of this state may not use public funds to facilitate the
 distribution by another person of a form the officer or employee
 would be prohibited from distributing under Subsection (a).
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a political party or a
 candidate for office may distribute a form described by Subsection
 (a) to a person who did not request it.
 (d)  An officer or employee of this state or of a political
 subdivision of this state commits an offense if the officer or
 employee violates Subsection (a) or (b).
 (e)  An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *