Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB532 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Sparks, Flores S.B. No. 532
 (In the Senate - Filed December 5, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture and
 Rural Affairs; March 31, 2025, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to grant amounts under the young farmer grant program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 58.093, Agriculture Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 58.093.  AMOUNT OF GRANTS. A grant under the young
 farmer grant program may not be less than $10,000 [$5,000] or more
 than $35,000 [$20,000].
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 grant issued on or after the effective date of this Act. A grant
 issued before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the grant is issued, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *