By: Menéndez S.B. No. 546 (In the Senate - Filed December 6, 2024; February 3, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 2; April 14, 2025, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 546 By: Hinojosa of Hidalgo A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to seat belts on buses that transport children. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 547.701, Transportation Code, is amended by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsections (f), (g), and (h) to read as follows: (e) In this subsection, "bus" includes a school bus, school activity bus, multifunction school activity bus, or school-chartered bus. Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a [A] bus operated by or contracted for use by a school district for the transportation of schoolchildren shall be equipped with a three-point seat belt for each passenger, including the operator. This subsection does not apply to: (1) a bus operated by or contracted for use [purchased by a school district that is a model year 2017 or earlier; or [(2) a bus purchased] by a school district [that is a model year 2018 or later] if the board of trustees for the school district[: [(A)] determines that the district's budget does not permit the district to purchase a bus that is equipped with the seat belts required by this subsection; or (2) a bus for which the warranty would become void if the bus were equipped to comply with this subsection[; and [(B) votes to approve that determination in a public meeting]. (f) The board of trustees of a school district that makes a determination under Subsection (e)(1) shall submit to the Texas Education Agency and present in a public meeting of the board a report that includes: (1) the number of buses operated by or contracted for use by the district that: (A) are not equipped with seat belts; (B) are equipped with two-point seat belts; and (C) are equipped with three-point seat belts; and (2) the estimated cost to the district to equip with three-point seat belts each bus operated by or contracted for use by the district that is not equipped with three-point seat belts as required by Subsection (e). (g) The Texas Education Agency shall: (1) collect the information submitted under Subsection (f); (2) calculate the total amount of financial assistance needed for all school districts to come into full compliance with Subsection (e); and (3) summarize and make available to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each member of the legislature the information described by Subdivisions (1) and (2). (h) A school district may accept gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private source to implement the requirements of Subsection (e). SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Section 547.701(e), Transportation Code, as amended by this Act, a school district is not required to comply with that subsection before September 1, 2029. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. * * * * *