Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB578 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/24/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 578
 (In the Senate - Filed December 13, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 March 24, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 24, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 578 By:  Gutierrez




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to surveillance cameras for certain housing developments
 that receive an allocation of low income housing tax credits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.6741 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.6741.  SURVEILLANCE CAMERAS REQUIRED. (a) A
 development that has received an allocation of low income housing
 tax credits under this subchapter must install and maintain
 operable exterior surveillance cameras at appropriate locations
 throughout the development.
 (b)  This section does not apply to a development located in
 a rural area.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2306.6741, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a development that receives an allocation
 of low income housing tax credits from an application cycle that is
 based on the 2026 qualified allocation plan or a subsequent plan
 adopted by the governing board of the Texas Department of Housing
 and Community Affairs. A development that receives an allocation
 of low income housing tax credits from an application cycle that is
 based on an earlier qualified allocation plan is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the application cycle began, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *