Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB584 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2025

                    By: West S.B. No. 584
 (In the Senate - Filed December 13, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 9, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; April 9, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the responsibility of consumer reporting agencies to
 ensure compliance with certain consumer reporting laws.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 20.05, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  A consumer reporting agency that prepares a consumer
 report using information obtained from another consumer reporting
 agency or a third party shall ensure that the information obtained
 is compiled and furnished by the agency in a consumer report in a
 manner that complies with this section.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a consumer report furnished on or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *