Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB599 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/24/2025

                    By: West S.B. No. 599
 (In the Senate - Filed December 13, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 24, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 March 24, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 599 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a political subdivision to regulate a
 licensed, registered, or listed group day-care home or family home.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 250, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 250.014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 250.014.  GROUP DAY-CARE HOME AND FAMILY HOME
 REGULATORY CERTAINTY.  A political subdivision may not adopt or
 enforce an ordinance, order, or other measure that requires a group
 day-care home or family home licensed, registered, or listed under
 Chapter 42, Human Resources Code, to comply with health and safety
 standards that exceed the standards established by statute or
 Health and Human Services Commission rule.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *