Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB650 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/18/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 650
 (In the Senate - Filed December 18, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 18, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 18, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 650 By:  Hughes




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the use of electronically readable
 information to verify a purchaser's age in the retail sale of
 alcoholic beverages.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 109.61, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A person shall access electronically readable
 information on a driver's license, commercial driver's license, or
 identification certificate for the purpose of verifying a
 purchaser's age in any retail sale of an alcoholic beverage.  This
 subsection does not apply to the retail sale of an alcoholic
 beverage on the premises of the holder of a package store permit.
 (a-2)  The commission shall not take any disciplinary action
 against the holder of a permit or license issued under this code for
 a violation of Subsection (a-1) for the retail sale of an alcoholic
 beverage made before September 1, 2027. This subsection expires
 September 1, 2028.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2027, the Texas
 Alcoholic Beverage Commission shall adopt rules to implement
 Section 109.61(a-1), Alcoholic Beverage Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *