Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB650 Senate Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 03/18/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   C.S.S.B. 650     89R19848 SCF-D   By: West         State Affairs         3/14/2025         Committee Report (Substituted)          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   According to Forbes, Texas has the third-highest rate of any state of drunk drivers under age 21 being involved in fatal crashes (0.94 per 100,000 licensed drivers).   Although under Texas law it is illegal to sell alcohol to a minor, the front line of defense against selling alcohol to minorsconvenience and grocery store clerksare often faced with making determinations of whether or not an identification presented is actually valid to allow the holder to purchase alcohol. The rise in fake identification cards, made to look very much like state identification and driver licenses, has made it more difficult for store clerks to determine if an identification presented is real or fake.   Clerks' failure to be able to determine whether or not a presented identification is valid or not can lead to dangerous situations, such as minors being sold and allowed to consume alcohol. One such preventable death occurred in Dallas in the spring of 2022.   Deshawn Jagwan, an 18-year-old Woodrow Wilson High School senior, went to a convenience store on his prom night and, using a fake ID, made multiple alcohol purchases at multiple times with multiple store clerks. Deshawn consumed the alcohol, became intoxicated, and was killed when the vehicle he was driving crashed.   S.B. 650 seeks to ensure that there are no more stories like Deshawn's.   S.B. 650 will require all establishments selling alcohol to, by January 1, 2027, begin using a system that will swipe identification cards to determine if they are real or fakea system commonly in use at multiple retailers around the country.   The committee substitute will exclude liquor stores, as you must be 21 to enter a liquor store.   (Original Author's/Sponsor's Statement of Intent)   C.S.S.B. 650 amends current law relating to requiring the use of electronically readable information to verify a purchaser's age in the retail sale of alcoholic beverages.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   Rulemaking authority is expressly granted to the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission in SECTION 2 of this bill.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 109.61, Alcoholic Beverage Code, by adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2), as follows:   (a-1) Requires a person to access electronically readable information on a driver's license, commercial driver's license, or identification certificate for the purpose of verifying a purchaser's age in any retail sale of an alcoholic beverage. Provides that this subsection does not apply to the retail sale of an alcoholic beverage on the premises of the holder of a package store permit.   (a-2) Prohibits the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission from taking any disciplinary action against the holder of a permit or license issued under the Alcoholic Beverage Code for a violation of Subsection (a-1) for the retail sale of an alcoholic beverage made before September 1, 2027. Provides that this subsection expires September 1, 2028.   SECTION 2. Requires the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission, not later than September 1, 2027, to adopt rules to implement Section 109.61(a-1), Alcoholic Beverage Code, as added by this Act.   SECTION 3. Effective date: September 1, 2025.

BILL ANALYSIS

Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 650
89R19848 SCF-D By: West
 State Affairs
 3/14/2025
 Committee Report (Substituted)



Senate Research Center

C.S.S.B. 650

89R19848 SCF-D

By: West

State Affairs

3/14/2025

Committee Report (Substituted)

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

According to Forbes, Texas has the third-highest rate of any state of drunk drivers under age 21 being involved in fatal crashes (0.94 per 100,000 licensed drivers).

Although under Texas law it is illegal to sell alcohol to a minor, the front line of defense against selling alcohol to minorsconvenience and grocery store clerksare often faced with making determinations of whether or not an identification presented is actually valid to allow the holder to purchase alcohol. The rise in fake identification cards, made to look very much like state identification and driver licenses, has made it more difficult for store clerks to determine if an identification presented is real or fake.

Clerks' failure to be able to determine whether or not a presented identification is valid or not can lead to dangerous situations, such as minors being sold and allowed to consume alcohol. One such preventable death occurred in Dallas in the spring of 2022.

Deshawn Jagwan, an 18-year-old Woodrow Wilson High School senior, went to a convenience store on his prom night and, using a fake ID, made multiple alcohol purchases at multiple times with multiple store clerks. Deshawn consumed the alcohol, became intoxicated, and was killed when the vehicle he was driving crashed.

S.B. 650 seeks to ensure that there are no more stories like Deshawn's.

S.B. 650 will require all establishments selling alcohol to, by January 1, 2027, begin using a system that will swipe identification cards to determine if they are real or fakea system commonly in use at multiple retailers around the country.

The committee substitute will exclude liquor stores, as you must be 21 to enter a liquor store.

(Original Author's/Sponsor's Statement of Intent)

C.S.S.B. 650 amends current law relating to requiring the use of electronically readable information to verify a purchaser's age in the retail sale of alcoholic beverages.

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

Rulemaking authority is expressly granted to the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission in SECTION 2 of this bill.

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

SECTION 1. Amends Section 109.61, Alcoholic Beverage Code, by adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2), as follows:

(a-1) Requires a person to access electronically readable information on a driver's license, commercial driver's license, or identification certificate for the purpose of verifying a purchaser's age in any retail sale of an alcoholic beverage. Provides that this subsection does not apply to the retail sale of an alcoholic beverage on the premises of the holder of a package store permit.

(a-2) Prohibits the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission from taking any disciplinary action against the holder of a permit or license issued under the Alcoholic Beverage Code for a violation of Subsection (a-1) for the retail sale of an alcoholic beverage made before September 1, 2027. Provides that this subsection expires September 1, 2028.

SECTION 2. Requires the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission, not later than September 1, 2027, to adopt rules to implement Section 109.61(a-1), Alcoholic Beverage Code, as added by this Act.

SECTION 3. Effective date: September 1, 2025.