Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB651 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/02/2025

                    By: West S.B. No. 651
 (In the Senate - Filed December 18, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs;
 April 2, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 2, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 651 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that a veterans county service office
 report to the commissioners court or a designated county executive
 official.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 434.032(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  In a county with a population of 200,000 or more, the
 commissioners court shall maintain a veterans county service
 office. The office must:
 (1)  be separate and distinct from other county
 offices;
 (2)  be staffed by at least one full-time employee; and
 (3)  report directly to the commissioners court or a
 designated county executive official.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *