Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB660 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 12/19/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 660     89R5194 MPF-D   By: West         Health & Human Services         3/14/2025         As Filed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   In recent history, reports of crashes at hospital or emergency room entrances have surged. This issue has not only intensified in Texas but has also been reported across the United States, resulting in numerous tragedies. According to media and official reports, in the United States, there have been more than 400 crashes into medical facilities in the last decade and 22 of those incidents resulted in fatalities. Additionally, in Texas alone, there have been more than 100 incidents since 2014.   On February 13, 2024, a sedan smashed into the emergency room at St. David's North Austin Medical Center. One person was reported deceased, and five others were injured, including a family of four. In response, a Texas municipality with nearly one million residents has implemented a new ordinance requiring security barriers at all new hospital entrances.    S.B. 660 aims to ensure that the necessary safety measures are implemented outside healthcare facilities across the State of Texas by requiring hospitals to install crash-rated bollards or other similar safety barriers near emergency room entrances that are located near areas with vehicular traffic.    S.B. 660 will require the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission to adopt rules as necessary to implement these security measures, ensuring that healthcare facilities provide a safer environment for all visitors and staff.   Most importantly, S.B. 660 will protect the lives of those who visit healthcare facilities, while also shielding hospitals from costly repairs and lawsuits, allowing providers to focus their attention on patient care.    As proposed, S.B. 660 amends current law relating to the installation of bollards or another safety barrier adjacent to certain hospital emergency rooms.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   Rulemaking authority is expressly granted to the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission in SECTION 2 (Section 311.025, Health and Safety Code) of this bill.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends the heading to Subchapter B, Chapter 311, Health and Safety Code, to read as follows:   SUBCHAPTER B. EMERGENCY SERVICES; EMERGENCY ROOMS   SECTION 2. Amends Subchapter B, Chapter 311, Health and Safety Code, by adding Section 311.025, as follows:   Sec. 311.025. EMERGENCY ROOM CRASH BARRIERS REQUIRED. (a) Defines "hospital."   (b) Requires a hospital, if the hospital maintains an emergency room located near an area with vehicular traffic, to install crash-rated bollards or another similar safety barrier adjacent to the emergency room in a manner likely to prevent a motor vehicle from crashing into the emergency room.   (c) Requires the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission (executive commissioner) to adopt rules as necessary to implement this section.   SECTION 3. (a) Requires the executive commissioner, as soon as practicable after the effective date of this Act but not later than December 1, 2025, to adopt rules as required by Section 311.025(c), Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.   (b) Provides that a hospital to which Section 311.025, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, applies is not required to comply with the requirements of that section until January 1, 2026.   SECTION 4. Effective date: September 1, 2025.

BILL ANALYSIS

Senate Research Center S.B. 660
89R5194 MPF-D By: West
 Health & Human Services
 3/14/2025
 As Filed



Senate Research Center

S.B. 660

89R5194 MPF-D

By: West

Health & Human Services

3/14/2025

As Filed

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

In recent history, reports of crashes at hospital or emergency room entrances have surged. This issue has not only intensified in Texas but has also been reported across the United States, resulting in numerous tragedies. According to media and official reports, in the United States, there have been more than 400 crashes into medical facilities in the last decade and 22 of those incidents resulted in fatalities. Additionally, in Texas alone, there have been more than 100 incidents since 2014.

On February 13, 2024, a sedan smashed into the emergency room at St. David's North Austin Medical Center. One person was reported deceased, and five others were injured, including a family of four. In response, a Texas municipality with nearly one million residents has implemented a new ordinance requiring security barriers at all new hospital entrances.

S.B. 660 aims to ensure that the necessary safety measures are implemented outside healthcare facilities across the State of Texas by requiring hospitals to install crash-rated bollards or other similar safety barriers near emergency room entrances that are located near areas with vehicular traffic.

S.B. 660 will require the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission to adopt rules as necessary to implement these security measures, ensuring that healthcare facilities provide a safer environment for all visitors and staff.

Most importantly, S.B. 660 will protect the lives of those who visit healthcare facilities, while also shielding hospitals from costly repairs and lawsuits, allowing providers to focus their attention on patient care.

As proposed, S.B. 660 amends current law relating to the installation of bollards or another safety barrier adjacent to certain hospital emergency rooms.

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

Rulemaking authority is expressly granted to the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission in SECTION 2 (Section 311.025, Health and Safety Code) of this bill.

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

SECTION 1. Amends the heading to Subchapter B, Chapter 311, Health and Safety Code, to read as follows:

SUBCHAPTER B. EMERGENCY SERVICES; EMERGENCY ROOMS

SECTION 2. Amends Subchapter B, Chapter 311, Health and Safety Code, by adding Section 311.025, as follows:

Sec. 311.025. EMERGENCY ROOM CRASH BARRIERS REQUIRED. (a) Defines "hospital."

(b) Requires a hospital, if the hospital maintains an emergency room located near an area with vehicular traffic, to install crash-rated bollards or another similar safety barrier adjacent to the emergency room in a manner likely to prevent a motor vehicle from crashing into the emergency room.

(c) Requires the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission (executive commissioner) to adopt rules as necessary to implement this section.

SECTION 3. (a) Requires the executive commissioner, as soon as practicable after the effective date of this Act but not later than December 1, 2025, to adopt rules as required by Section 311.025(c), Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.

(b) Provides that a hospital to which Section 311.025, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, applies is not required to comply with the requirements of that section until January 1, 2026.

SECTION 4. Effective date: September 1, 2025.