Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB769 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/31/2025

                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 769     89R1004 JTZ-F   By: Menndez         Education K-16         3/31/2025         As Filed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Students with disabilities at Texas colleges and universities have noted a lack of access to necessary accommodations during their studies. In addition, many students feel they are at a higher disadvantage when applying to or enrolling in Texas colleges and universities.    While roughly half of high school graduates enroll in a higher education institution immediately after graduating, only an estimated 31 percent of students with disabilities had done so by two years after their graduation. Many barriers are keeping students with disabilities from enrolling into Texas colleges, including but not limited to, accessibility of campuses and dorms, lack of assistance with an application, and little information about special services offered that aid students with disabilities. Currently, Texas lack the state-produced data we need to understand and adequately address the issue within our institutions of higher education. Understanding the root problem and obtaining information on how higher education institutions can improve will help raise the number of students with disabilities that are enrolling in a higher education institution.    S.B. 769 instructs the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to study and report to the legislature on the state of students with disabilities in Texas colleges and universities. That includes any barriers to admission, total enrollment levels, availability of accommodations, and related school policies.    As proposed, S.B. 769 amends current law relating to a report by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board regarding enrollment and success in higher education for students with disabilities.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, by adding Section 61.06642, as follows:   Sec. 61.06642. REPORT REGARDING ENROLLMENT AND SUCCESS IN HIGHER EDUCATION FOR STUDENTS WITH DISABILITIES. (a) Requires the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board (THECB), not later than September 1, 2026, to prepare and submit to the legislature a report on enrollment and success in higher education for students with a disability.   (b) Requires that the report identify, to the extent practicable, certain factors that influence the enrollment and success of students with disabilities in higher education.   (c) Requires an institution of higher education to provide to THECB on request, and authorizes THECB to request from a private or independent institution of higher education, any information necessary for THECB to prepare the report.   (d) Provides that this section expires September 1, 2027.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2025.  

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 769
89R1004 JTZ-F By: Menndez
 Education K-16
 3/31/2025
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 769

89R1004 JTZ-F

By: Menndez

 

Education K-16

 

3/31/2025

 

As Filed

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Students with disabilities at Texas colleges and universities have noted a lack of access to necessary accommodations during their studies. In addition, many students feel they are at a higher disadvantage when applying to or enrolling in Texas colleges and universities. 

 

While roughly half of high school graduates enroll in a higher education institution immediately after graduating, only an estimated 31 percent of students with disabilities had done so by two years after their graduation. Many barriers are keeping students with disabilities from enrolling into Texas colleges, including but not limited to, accessibility of campuses and dorms, lack of assistance with an application, and little information about special services offered that aid students with disabilities. Currently, Texas lack the state-produced data we need to understand and adequately address the issue within our institutions of higher education. Understanding the root problem and obtaining information on how higher education institutions can improve will help raise the number of students with disabilities that are enrolling in a higher education institution. 

 

S.B. 769 instructs the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to study and report to the legislature on the state of students with disabilities in Texas colleges and universities. That includes any barriers to admission, total enrollment levels, availability of accommodations, and related school policies. 

 

As proposed, S.B. 769 amends current law relating to a report by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board regarding enrollment and success in higher education for students with disabilities.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, by adding Section 61.06642, as follows:

 

Sec. 61.06642. REPORT REGARDING ENROLLMENT AND SUCCESS IN HIGHER EDUCATION FOR STUDENTS WITH DISABILITIES. (a) Requires the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board (THECB), not later than September 1, 2026, to prepare and submit to the legislature a report on enrollment and success in higher education for students with a disability.

 

(b) Requires that the report identify, to the extent practicable, certain factors that influence the enrollment and success of students with disabilities in higher education.

 

(c) Requires an institution of higher education to provide to THECB on request, and authorizes THECB to request from a private or independent institution of higher education, any information necessary for THECB to prepare the report.

 

(d) Provides that this section expires September 1, 2027.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2025.