Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB815 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/13/2025

                    By: Schwertner, Cook S.B. No. 815
 (In the Senate - Filed January 16, 2025; February 7, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 13, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 2; March 13, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 815 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain automated systems or personnel in,
 and certain adverse determinations made in connection with, the
 health benefit claims process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 843, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 843.114 to read as follows:
 Sec. 843.114.  CERTAIN DISCLOSURES REQUIRED IN EXPLANATION
 OF BENEFITS.  A health maintenance organization shall include in a
 written explanation of benefits provided to an enrollee and a
 physician or health care provider:
 (1)  a disclosure stating whether artificial
 intelligence was used in any part of the claims process, including
 coverage determinations and utilization review; and
 (2)  if applicable, a plain language description of the
 method by which the health maintenance organization or utilization
 review agent used artificial intelligence.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 1301, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1301.011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.011.  CERTAIN DISCLOSURES REQUIRED IN EXPLANATION
 OF BENEFITS.  An insurer shall include in a written explanation of
 benefits provided to an insured and a physician or health care
 provider:
 (1)  a disclosure stating whether artificial
 intelligence was used in any part of the claims process, including
 coverage determinations and utilization review; and
 (2)  if applicable, a plain language description of the
 method by which the insurer or utilization review agent used
 artificial intelligence.
 SECTION 3.  Section 4201.002, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (1) and adding Subdivisions (1-a), (1-b), and
 (1-c) to read as follows:
 (1)  "Adverse determination" means a determination by a
 utilization review agent that health care services provided or
 proposed to be provided to a patient are not medically necessary or
 appropriate or are experimental or investigational.
 (1-a)  "Algorithm" means a computerized procedure
 consisting of a set of steps used to accomplish a determined task.
 (1-b)  "Artificial intelligence system" means any
 machine learning-based system that, for any explicit or implicit
 objective, infers from the inputs the system receives how to
 generate outputs, including content, decisions, predictions, and
 recommendations, that can influence physical or virtual
 environments.
 (1-c)  "Automated decision system" means an algorithm,
 including an algorithm incorporating an artificial intelligence
 system, that uses data-based analytics to make, support, suggest,
 or recommend certain determinations, decisions, judgments, or
 conclusions.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter D, Chapter 4201, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 4201.156 to read as follows:
 Sec. 4201.156.  USE OF AUTOMATED DECISION SYSTEM FOR ADVERSE
 DETERMINATIONS. (a)  A utilization review agent may not use an
 automated decision system in any way to suggest, recommend,
 generate, provide, make, or assist in making, wholly or partly, an
 adverse determination.  As provided by and subject to Section
 4201.254, only an appropriate physician, dentist, or other licensed
 health care provider may make an adverse determination in
 accordance with Section 4201.254.
 (b)  The commissioner may audit and inspect at any time a
 utilization review agent's use of an automated decision system for
 utilization review.
 (c)  This section does not prohibit the use of an automated
 decision system for administrative or fraud-detection functions in
 connection with utilization review.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter F, Chapter 4201, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 4201.254 to read as follows:
 Sec. 4201.254.  PERSONNEL REQUIRED FOR ADVERSE
 DETERMINATION. (a)  An adverse determination must be made by an
 appropriate physician, dentist, or other health care provider who
 is:
 (1)  an individual licensed in this state under Title
 3, Occupations Code; and
 (2)  acting in accordance with the laws of this state
 including requirements under Section 4201.252 and within the scope
 of the individual's applicable license issued under Title 3,
 Occupations Code.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, for a health care service
 ordered, requested, provided, or to be provided by a physician, an
 adverse determination must be made by a physician with a permanent
 unrestricted license to practice medicine in this state who is of
 the same or similar specialty as the physician who ordered,
 requested, provided, or proposes to provide the service.
 (c)  Nothing in this section authorizes an individual to act
 outside of the scope of the individual's applicable license issued
 under Title 3, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 6.  Section 4201.303(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Notice of an adverse determination must include:
 (1)  the principal reasons for the adverse
 determination;
 (2)  the clinical basis for the adverse determination;
 (3)  a description of and [or] the source of the
 screening criteria and review procedures used as guidelines in
 making the adverse determination; and
 (4)  a description of the procedure for the complaint
 and appeal process, including notice to the enrollee of the
 enrollee's right to appeal an adverse determination to an
 independent review organization and of the procedures to obtain
 that review.
 SECTION 7.  (a) Sections 843.114 and 1301.011, Insurance
 Code, as added by this Act, apply only to the provision of a health
 care service under a health benefit plan delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2026.
 (b)  Chapter 4201, Insurance Code, as amended by this Act,
 applies only to utilization review conducted for a health benefit
 plan delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January
 1, 2026.  Utilization review conducted for a health benefit plan
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2026,
 is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *