Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB816 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/23/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 816
 (In the Senate - Filed January 16, 2025; February 7, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 23, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 23, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 816 By:  Flores




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing the disclosure of certain electronic
 customer data by a provider of an electronic communications service
 or a remote computing service in certain immediate life-threatening
 situations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Articles 18B.502(a) and (b), Code of Criminal
 Procedure, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (c) and Article
 18B.5025, a provider of an electronic communications service may
 not knowingly divulge the contents of a communication that is in
 electronic storage.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c) and Article
 18B.5025, a provider of a remote computing service may not
 knowingly divulge the contents of a communication that:
 (1)  is in electronic storage on behalf of a subscriber
 or customer of the service provider;
 (2)  is received by means of electronic transmission
 from the subscriber or customer or created by means of computer
 processing of communications received by means of electronic
 transmission from the subscriber or customer; and
 (3)  is solely for the purpose of providing storage or
 computer processing services to the subscriber or customer, if the
 service provider is not authorized to obtain access to the contents
 of that communication for purposes of providing any service other
 than storage or computer processing.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter K, Chapter 18B, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Article 18B.5025 to read as
 follows:
 Art. 18B.5025.  DISCLOSURE IN IMMEDIATE LIFE-THREATENING
 SITUATION. A provider of an electronic communications service or a
 provider of a remote computing service may disclose electronic
 customer data to a governmental entity if the provider in good faith
 believes an immediate life-threatening situation exists that
 requires the immediate disclosure of the electronic customer data
 to assist in preventing any death or serious bodily injury that may
 result from the immediate life-threatening situation.
 SECTION 3.  Article 18B.552, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 18B.552.  NO CAUSE OF ACTION.  (a) A subscriber or
 customer of a provider of an electronic communications service or a
 provider of a remote computing service does not have a cause of
 action against a service provider or the service provider's
 officers, employees, or agents or against other specified persons
 for providing information, facilities, or assistance as required by
 a court order, warrant, subpoena, or certification under this
 chapter.
 (b)  A person does not have a cause of action against a
 provider of an electronic communications service or a provider of a
 remote computing service or the service provider's officers,
 employees, or agents for disclosing electronic customer data to a
 governmental entity as authorized by Article 18B.5025.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 disclosure of electronic customer data by a provider of an
 electronic communications service or a remote computing service
 made on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *