Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB827 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/26/2025

                    By: Parker S.B. No. 827
 (In the Senate - Filed January 16, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 26, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; March 26, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 827 By:  Parker


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the audit of an election using an electronic voting
 system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 127.201, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 127.201.  HAND [PARTIAL] COUNT ELECTION AUDIT [OF
 ELECTRONIC VOTING SYSTEM BALLOTS BY GENERAL CUSTODIAN].  (a)  To
 ensure the accuracy of the tabulation of electronic voting system
 results, the general custodian of election records shall conduct a
 manual count of all the races in at least one percent of the
 election day polling locations and one percent of the early voting
 locations [precincts] or in three election day polling locations
 and three early voting locations [precincts], whichever is greater,
 in which the electronic voting system was used. The general
 custodian shall conduct a manual count of all the races contained on
 the ballots by mail in at least one percent of the precincts in
 which a ballot by mail was cast and in which the ballots were
 counted using automatic tabulating equipment, or in three precincts
 in which a ballot by mail was cast and in which the ballots were
 counted using automatic tabulating equipment, whichever is
 greater. The custodian shall select the polling locations and
 precincts at random and shall begin the count not later than 72
 hours after the polls close. The count shall be completed not later
 than the 21st day after election day. Subsections [Subsection]
 (b), (b-1), (b-2), and (b-3) supersede [supersedes] this subsection
 to the extent of a conflict.
 (b)  In a general election for state and county officers,
 primary election, or election on a proposed amendment to the state
 constitution or other statewide measure submitted by the
 legislature, the secretary of state shall select, in accordance
 with rules adopted by the secretary, the polling locations and
 precincts to be counted under Subsection (a). The secretary shall
 designate not more than three offices and not more than three
 propositions to be counted in the selected polling locations and
 precincts. The secretary shall notify the general custodian of
 election records of the polling locations, precincts, offices, and
 propositions selected under this subsection not earlier than the
 day after election day.
 (b-1)  The general custodian of election records shall
 designate the members of the early voting ballot board for the
 election to perform the manual count under this section at the
 direction of the custodian. If one or more members of the early
 voting ballot board are unable to serve, then additional members
 may be appointed using the appointment procedures under Section
 87.002.
 (b-2)  In an election in which a statewide risk-limiting
 audit is performed under Subchapter I, the manual count under this
 section shall begin the count not later than the first business day
 after the secretary of state has certified the completion of the
 risk-limiting audit, and the count must be completed not later than
 the 30th day after election day or by the deadline designated by the
 secretary of state for completion of the count, whichever is later.
 (b-3)  The general custodian of election records, in
 accordance with procedures prescribed by the secretary of state,
 may select additional precincts and polling places to be counted
 under this section.
 (c)  On selection or notification, as applicable, of the
 polling locations and precincts to be counted, the general
 custodian of election records shall post in the custodian's office
 a notice of the date, hour, and place of the count.
 (d)  Each person entitled to appoint watchers [candidate] in
 the election is entitled to be present at the count and is entitled
 to have a watcher [representative] present.  A watcher appointed to
 the count [representative] must satisfy the same eligibility
 requirements as a watcher under Chapter 33 and must be appointed in
 the same manner as a watcher under Chapter 33. The watcher must
 deliver their certificates [a certificate of appointment] to the
 presiding judge of the early voting ballot board [general
 custodian] at the time the watcher [representative] reports for
 service. [The certificate must be in writing and must include:
 [(1)  the printed name and signature of the
 representative;
 [(2)  the election subject to the count; and
 [(3)  the printed name and signature of the candidate
 making the appointment.]
 (e)  Not later than the third day after the date the count is
 completed, the general custodian of election records shall:
 (1)  deliver a written report of the results of the
 count to the secretary of state; and
 (2)  post the results of the count on the county's
 Internet website in the same location that the county provides
 information on election returns and election results.
 (g)  This section does not apply to the tabulation of
 electronic voting system results for a voting system that uses
 direct recording electronic voting machines.
 SECTION 2.  Section 127.302, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsection (a-1)
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The [Not later than 24 hours after all ballots have been
 counted in an election, the] general custodian of election records
 shall participate in [conduct] a risk-limiting audit for one or
 more [a] selected statewide races [race] or measures [measure].
 The custodian shall begin the audit on a date prescribed by the
 secretary of state.
 (a-1)  All counties holding an election subject to this
 subchapter must participate in the risk-limiting audit on the
 selected statewide races or measures as provided by this section,
 regardless of the method of counting voted ballots used by the
 county.
 (b)  The secretary of state shall select, in accordance with
 rules adopted by the secretary, the precincts to be counted and the
 offices [office] or propositions [proposition] to be counted.
 (c)  The general custodian of election records shall
 complete the audit on the date prescribed by the secretary of state
 [not later than 24 hours before the time for conducting the canvass
 of the election].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *