Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB863 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/07/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Perry S.B. No. 863
 (In the Senate - Filed January 22, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture and
 Rural Affairs; April 7, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 863 By:  Perry




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to water withdrawn from the Edwards Aquifer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.34(b), Chapter 626, Acts of the 73rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1993, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Water withdrawn from the aquifer may not be transported
 outside the boundaries of the authority via pipeline or other means
 for any purpose. Water withdrawn from the aquifer must be used
 within:
 (1)  the boundaries of the authority; or
 (2)  the certificated area of a retail public utility
 according to a certificate of convenience and necessity, as the
 certificate existed on September 1, 2025, any part of which was
 located within the boundaries of the authority on June 28, 1996.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *