Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB875 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/17/2025

                    By: Birdwell, Bettencourt S.B. No. 875
 (In the Senate - Filed January 22, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 17, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; March 17, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting election activities committed by a member
 of the board of trustees or superintendent of an independent school
 district or on certain school district premises; creating criminal
 offenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.169, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 11.169.  ELECTIONEERING PROHIBITED.  (a)
 Notwithstanding any other law, a member of the board of trustees of
 an independent school district commits an offense if the member
 uses [may not use] state or local funds or other resources of the
 district, including a district e-mail address, district telephone,
 mailing list maintained by the district, or meeting organized by or
 held on the premises of the district, to electioneer for or against
 any candidate, measure, or political party.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.201, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (f) and (g) to read as follows:
 (f)  Notwithstanding any other law, the superintendent of a
 school district commits an offense if the superintendent uses state
 or local funds or other resources of the district, including a
 district e-mail address, district telephone, mailing list
 maintained by the district, or meeting organized by or held on the
 premises of the district, to electioneer for or against any
 candidate, measure, or political party.
 (g)  An offense under Subsection (f) is a Class A
 misdemeanor.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 276, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Section 276.020 to read as follows:
 Sec. 276.020.  UNLAWFUL ELECTION ACTIVITY ON CERTAIN
 INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT CAMPUSES. (a)  The chief administrator
 of the campus of an independent school district commits an offense
 if the administrator knowingly permits the posting of political
 signs on the premises of the campus for longer than 48 hours during
 any time other than:
 (1)  the early voting period, if the campus is being
 used as an early voting polling place; or
 (2)  on election day, if the campus is being used as a
 polling place.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.  An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *