Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB893 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/17/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Johnson, Kolkhorst S.B. No. 893
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 17, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; March 17, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 893 By:  Perry




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to criminal offenses for creating and distributing certain
 misleading images and videos; creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 255.004, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 255.004.  FALSE IMAGES, VIDEOS, AND SOURCES [TRUE
 SOURCE] OF COMMUNICATION.
 SECTION 2.  Section 255.004, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (c), (d), and (e) and adding Subsections (d-1)
 and (d-2) to read as follows:
 (c)  An offense under Subsection (a), (b), or (d) [this
 section] is a Class A misdemeanor. An offense under Subsection
 (d-1) is a Class B misdemeanor.
 (d)  A person commits an offense if the person, with the
 intent to deceive and with the intent to injure a candidate or
 influence the result of an election:
 (1)  creates or causes to be created a deep fake video;
 and
 (2)  publishes, distributes, or causes [the deep fake
 video] to be published or distributed the deep fake video [within 30
 days of an election].
 (d-1)  A person commits an offense if the person, with the
 intent to deceive and influence the result of an election:
 (1)  creates or causes to be created an altered image;
 and
 (2)  publishes, distributes, or causes to be published
 or distributed the altered image.
 (d-2)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution for an
 offense under Subsection (d-1) if the person includes on the image a
 clear label stating that the image is altered.
 (e)  In this section:
 (1)  "Altered image" means an image that has been
 manipulated to change the physical appearance of an individual or
 depict an individual performing an action that the individual did
 not perform. The term does not include:
 (A)  a cartoon, caricature, or any other image
 that a reasonable viewer would understand to be a satirical
 representation of the individual; or
 (B)  an image altered only to change the
 saturation, brightness, contrast, color, or any other superficial
 quality of the image.
 (2)  "Deep[, "deep] fake video" means a video[, created
 with the intent to deceive,] that appears to depict a real person
 performing an action that the person did not perform [occur in
 reality].
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *