By: Blanco S.B. No. 896 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2025; February 13, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services; March 24, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 24, 2025, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 896 By: Hancock A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the enrollment period for newborns under certain health benefit plans. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 846.258(b), Insurance Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Coverage of a newborn child of a participating employee under this section ends on the 61st [32nd] day after the date of the child's birth unless: (1) children are eligible for coverage under the multiple employer welfare arrangement's plan document; and (2) not later than the 60th [31st] day after the date of birth, the arrangement receives: (A) notice of the birth; and (B) any required additional premium. SECTION 2. Section 1367.003, Insurance Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 1367.003. CERTAIN LIMITATIONS ON COVERAGE FOR NEWBORN CHILDREN PROHIBITED. A health benefit plan that provides maternity benefits or accident and health coverage for additional newborn children may not be issued in this state if the plan excludes or limits: (1) initial coverage of a newborn child before the 61st day after the date of the child's birth [for a period of time]; (2) coverage for congenital defects of a newborn child; or (3) coverage for administration of the newborn screening tests required by Section 33.011, Health and Safety Code, including for the cost of a newborn screening test kit in the amount provided by the Department of State Health Services on its Internet website under Section 33.019 of that code on the date the test was administered. SECTION 3. Section 1501.157(b), Insurance Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Coverage of a newborn child of a covered employee under this section ends on the 61st [32nd] day after the date of the child's birth unless, not later than the 60th [31st] day after the date of birth, the small employer health benefit plan issuer receives: (1) notice of the birth; and (2) any required additional premium. SECTION 4. Section 1501.607(b), Insurance Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Coverage of a newborn child of a covered employee under this section ends on the 61st [32nd] day after the date of the child's birth unless: (1) children are eligible for coverage under the large employer health benefit plan; and (2) not later than the 60th [31st] day after the date of birth, the large employer health benefit plan issuer receives: (A) notice of the birth; and (B) any required additional premium. SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act applies only to a health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2026. A health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2026, is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. * * * * *