Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB896 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/24/2025

                    By: Blanco S.B. No. 896
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 24, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 March 24, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 896 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enrollment period for newborns under certain health
 benefit plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 846.258(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Coverage of a newborn child of a participating employee
 under this section ends on the 61st [32nd] day after the date of the
 child's birth unless:
 (1)  children are eligible for coverage under the
 multiple employer welfare arrangement's plan document; and
 (2)  not later than the 60th [31st] day after the date
 of birth, the arrangement receives:
 (A)  notice of the birth; and
 (B)  any required additional premium.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1367.003, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1367.003.  CERTAIN LIMITATIONS ON COVERAGE FOR NEWBORN
 CHILDREN PROHIBITED.  A health benefit plan that provides
 maternity benefits or accident and health coverage for additional
 newborn children may not be issued in this state if the plan
 excludes or limits:
 (1)  initial coverage of a newborn child before the
 61st day after the date of the child's birth [for a period of time];
 (2)  coverage for congenital defects of a newborn
 child; or
 (3)  coverage for administration of the newborn
 screening tests required by Section 33.011, Health and Safety Code,
 including for the cost of a newborn screening test kit in the amount
 provided by the Department of State Health Services on its Internet
 website under Section 33.019 of that code on the date the test was
 administered.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1501.157(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Coverage of a newborn child of a covered employee under
 this section ends on the 61st [32nd] day after the date of the
 child's birth unless, not later than the 60th [31st] day after the
 date of birth, the small employer health benefit plan issuer
 receives:
 (1)  notice of the birth; and
 (2)  any required additional premium.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1501.607(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Coverage of a newborn child of a covered employee under
 this section ends on the 61st [32nd] day after the date of the
 child's birth unless:
 (1)  children are eligible for coverage under the large
 employer health benefit plan; and
 (2)  not later than the 60th [31st] day after the date
 of birth, the large employer health benefit plan issuer receives:
 (A)  notice of the birth; and
 (B)  any required additional premium.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
 renewed on or after January 1, 2026. A health benefit plan that is
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2026,
 is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *