Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB906 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

                    By: Blanco S.B. No. 906
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 31, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Ysleta del Sur Pueblo to commission
 peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 2A.003(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The tribal council of the Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of
 Texas, [or] of the Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas, or of the
 Ysleta del Sur Pueblo may employ and commission peace officers to
 enforce state law within the respective tribe's reservation.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *