Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB927 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2025

                    By: Hancock, Hagenbuch S.B. No. 927
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2025; February 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 27, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 27, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of Navy and Marine Corps Achievement Medal
 specialty license plates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.315, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (s) to read as follows:
 (s)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Navy and Marine Corps Achievement Medal. License
 plates issued under this subsection must include the Navy and
 Marine Corps Achievement Medal emblem and must include the words
 "Navy and Marine Corps Achievement Medal" at the bottom of each
 plate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *